HI HB2458 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a general excise tax at the wholesale rate of one-half of one per cent for the gross proceeds or income from all products produced from Hawaiian loko ia. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
General Excise Tax; Loko ia; Hawaiian Fishpond
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3074) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kim. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-16 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 311). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 902-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3). |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 462-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-10 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Say. |
2016-02-09 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-10-16 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |