HI HB2461 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-23-10 1:00PM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-23-10 1:00PM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a moratorium on the existing reference-based pricing program for prescription drug plan members through June 30, 2012; requires a study on the feasibility and long-term effects of reference-based pricing programs; requires pilot program to explore the use of mobile health vans; and provides for continuing coverage of prescription medication under any policy entered into by an insured or insurer on or after July 1, 2010. Effective 7/1/50.
Title
Reference-based Pricing; Prescription Drugs; Mobile Health Vans
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Robert Herkes [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-23-10 1:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-04-16 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-21-10 1:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-04-15 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-16-10 10:25AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 558). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Mizuno, Rhoads, Herkes, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Bertram, Finnegan. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 573). | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Takamine, Chair; Chun Oakland, Ige, Kim, Co-Chair(s); Taniguchi. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Re-referred to HLT/HUS/LAB/CPC/FIN, referral sheet 64. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 462). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 448) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3013) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-10 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) Reported from LBR/HMS/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2808) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Hee. | |
2010-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Nishihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR/HMS/HTH deferred the measure until 03-16-10 1:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR/HMS/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-10 2:50PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to LBR/HMS/HTH, WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 118). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 551-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-17 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Wakai, Ito, Karamatsu, Luke, Mizuno, Morita, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Cabanilla; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, McKelvey. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-17-10 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Magaoay, Sagum excused (3). | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 184-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Belatti, Bertram, Brower, Carroll, Mizuno, Shimabukuro; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Finnegan; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-01-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 01-29-10 9:30 AM in House conference room 329. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 5 | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2494 (Same As) 2010-04-21 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-23-10 1:00PM in conference room 229.