HI HB2461 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 662-5, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to allow the State of Hawaii to demand a trial by jury in the same manner as a private individual in a tort action.
Title
Government Tort Liability
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-13-12 2:05PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-12. | |
2012-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-10-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2723 (Same As) 2012-01-25 - (S) Referred to JDL.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2461 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB2461_.htm |