HI HB2487 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an electronic benefits cardholder to present photo identification for certain transactions.
Title
Electronic Benefits Transfer Card; Photo Identification
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-16 at 2:00 pm. |
2016-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-08-16 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2487&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2487_.HTM |