HI HB2487 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - The committee(s) on EEP/WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - The committee(s) on EEP/WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the sustainability coordinator of the office of planning to complete a study on implementing a green new deal for the State. Requires the study to identify federal and international polices; review Hawaii's environmental, economic, and cultural response to the green new deal; and determine cost-effective opportunities for Hawaii to implement the green new deal.
Title
Relating To A Hawaii Green New Deal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on EEP/WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WLH on Thursday, 02-06-20 9:15AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2487&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2487_.HTM |