HI HB249 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB249
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys for DOH lead poisoning prevention activities.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB113 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB249 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB249 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=249&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB249_.HTM |