HI HB2514 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to HOU/EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to HOU/EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Teacher Home Assistance Program to provide housing vouchers to certain eligible teachers. Appropriates funds out of the Teachers' Housing Revolving Fund. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Teacher Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HOU/EDU, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 403). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 881-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-26-24 12:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 565-24), recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-02-15 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, M. Mizuno, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Perruso, Quinlan. |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-15-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3). |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 71-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2024-02-02 | House | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kila, Todd. |
2024-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Friday, 02-02-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to HSG, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2987 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to HOU/EDU, WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Teacher Home Assistance Program
Teacher Recruitment and Retention
Teachers' Housing Revolving Fund
Teacher Home Assistance Program
Teacher Recruitment and Retention
Teachers' Housing Revolving Fund