HI HB2549 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows federal reimbursement moneys for disaster relief to be deposited into a trust account for future disaster relief.
Title
Major Disaster Trust Account; Federal Reimbursements
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused (3). | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 354-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Aquino, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Souki, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Yamashita, Pine. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-11-10 9:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2702 (Same As) 2010-05-10 - (S) Act 087, 5/10/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 545).