HI SB2702 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - (S) Act 087, 5/10/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 545).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - (S) Act 087, 5/10/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 545).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows federal reimbursement moneys for disaster relief to be deposited into a trust account for future disaster relief. Prohibits lapsing into general fund. Effective on approval. (CD1)
Title
Major Disaster Trust Account; Federal Reimbursements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | (S) Act 087, 5/10/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 545). | |
2010-05-10 | (H) Act 087, on 5/10/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 300). | |
2010-05-03 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 111-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-23 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 111-10). | |
2010-04-23 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Aquino, Awana, Shimabukuro, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-23-10 at 1:30pm in Conference Room 312. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-23-10 10:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-10 9:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-10 9:20AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-16 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-19-10 9:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-15 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-16-10 9:45AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-14 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-15-10 9:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-13 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-14-10 9:15AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Hanohano, Aquino Co-Chairs; Awana, Shimabukuro, Pine. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 534). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 533). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Kim, Co-Chair(s); Hemmings. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Deferred until 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 397). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Hanohano excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1215-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Har, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Coffman, Keith-Agaran. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-25-10 11:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Ching, Manahan, Nishimoto excused (4). | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 753-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Aquino, Awana, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Souki, Takumi, Yamashita, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee. | |
2010-03-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-11-10 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 34 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 247) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2430) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-10 10:05AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2197) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Gabbard, Galuteria, Kidani, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, English. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-10 1:25pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to PSM, WAM. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2549 (Same As) 2010-02-12 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused (3).