OH SB196 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 109.921, 124.38, 124.82, 173.521, 173.542, 305.03, 313.12, 503.241, 940.09, 1347.08, 1561.12, 1571.012, 1751.84, 1753.21, 2108.16, 2111.031, 2111.49, 2133.25, 2135.01, 2151.33, 2151.3515, 2151.421, 2305.235, 2313.14, 2317.47, 3101.05, 3105.091, 3111.12, 3119.05, 3119.54, 3304.23, 3309.22, 3309.41, 3309.45, 3313.64, 3313.716, 3313.72, 3319.141, 3319.143, 3321.04, 3501.382, 3701.031, 3701.046, 3701.144, 3701.146, 3701.162, 3701.243, 3701.245, 3701.262, 3701.47, 3701.48, 3701.50, 3701.505, 3701.5010, 3701.59, 3701.74, 3701.76, 3705.30, 3705.33, 3705.35, 3707.08, 3707.10, 3707.72, 3709.11, 3709.13, 3709.241, 3710.07, 3715.872, 3721.01, 3721.011, 3721.041, 3721.21, 3727.09, 3727.19, 3742.03, 3742.04, 3742.07, 3742.32, 3901.56, 3916.01, 3916.07, 3916.16, 3923.25, 3923.84, 3929.62, 3929.63, 3929.64, 3929.67, 4113.23, 4121.121, 4121.31, 4121.32, 4121.36, 4121.38, 4121.45, 4123.19, 4123.511, 4123.512, 4123.54, 4123.56, 4123.57, 4123.651, 4123.71, 4123.84, 4123.85, 4506.07, 4507.06, 4507.08, 4507.081, 4507.141, 4507.30, 4511.81, 4723.36, 4723.431, 4729.284, 4729.41, 4729.45, 4729.47, 5120.17, 5120.21, 5145.22, 5502.522, and 5739.01 and to enact sections 2135.15, 4723.437, 4723.438, and 4723.4812 of the Revised Code regarding the authority of advanced practice registered nurses.
Title
Regards authority of advanced practice registered nurses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | House | Introduced |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Passed |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Health |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Referred to committee: Health |
2023-11-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Employment : Workers' Compensation
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Senate Health Committee
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Senate Health Committee