HI HB2593 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act 117, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1218).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act 117, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1218).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds in the amount of $30,000,000 to assist Hawaii Renewable Resources, LLC, with the development of facilities for food crop, animal feed, and renewable non-fossil fuel production on Oahu. (SD1)
Title
Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Food Crop Production; Animal Feed Production; Renewable Energy; Hawaii Renewable Resources, LLC; Oahu ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Act 117, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1218). |
2016-06-23 | House | Act 117, on 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1218). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2016-05-03 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 675). |
2016-04-29 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-08-16. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 628). |
2016-04-25 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2016-04-21 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Gabbard, Dela Cruz Co-Chairs; Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tsuji, Onishi Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 468). |
2016-04-08 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 475) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-16. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3355) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported from TRE/WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3127) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Ruderman, Slom. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Gabbard, English, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-16 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to TRE/WLA, WAM. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 155). |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 792-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-02-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 309-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-11 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2016-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-11-16 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |