HI HB2594 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-17 - (H) Act 112, on 5/17/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 326).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-17 - (H) Act 112, on 5/17/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 326).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Conforming amendments to the Hawaii income tax law based upon amendments to the Internal Revenue Code for calendar year 2009. Effective upon its approval. (HB2594 CD1)
Title
Income Tax; Conformity to the Internal Revenue Code for 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-17 | (H) Act 112, on 5/17/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 326). | |
2010-05-17 | (S) Act 112, 5/17/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 570). | |
2010-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 140-10). | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 140-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-23 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kokubun; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, Chong, Choy, M. Lee, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-23-10 11:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-10 11:30AM in conference room 309. | |
2010-04-10 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday, 04-12-10 at 10:30AM in Conference Room 309. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Saturday, 04-10-10 11:30AM in conference room 309. | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 467). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 535). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) House conferees appointed: M. Oshiro Chair; Chong, Choy, M. Lee, Ward. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Kim, Chair; Kokubun, Hemmings. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 462). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 459) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2965) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Hee, Tokuda. | |
2010-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-23-10 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-10 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 131). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Souki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 523-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-22-10 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-16 | (H) HD 1 adopted and recommitted to FIN for further consideration with none voting no and Representative(s) Belatti, Bertram, Carroll, Choy, Evans excused. | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Recommends recommittal to FIN. | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 414-10) as amended in HD 1. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Sagum, Tokioka. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-10 4:30 PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2747 (Same As) 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 35