HI SB2747 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a measure for conforming amendments to the Hawaii income tax law based upon amendments to the Internal Revenue Code for calendar year 2009.
Title
Income Tax; Conformity to the Internal Revenue Code for 2009
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 35 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 257) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2500) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-24-10 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-10 10:20AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-17 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to WAM. | |
2010-02-17 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2336) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to WAM. | |
2010-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Tokuda. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-17-10 10:15AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2594 (Same As) 2010-05-17 - (H) Act 112, on 5/17/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 326).