HI HB2594 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 140, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1241).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 140, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1241).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the Kahoolawe Island Reserve Commission to restore, preserve, and determine the appropriate uses of Kahoolawe island, and to fund one full-time equivalent permanent cultural resource project coordinator position for the Kahoolawe Island Reserve Commission. (HB2594 CD1)
Title
Relating To The Kahoolawe Island Reserve Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Act 140, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1241). |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Act 140, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1241). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 119-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 119-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, English, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Yamane, DeCoite; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 787). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; English Co-Chair; Inouye. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ing, Yamane, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 748) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3539) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 10:50AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3063) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-18 3:01PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 361). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1039-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola. |
2018-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from OMH/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 368-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Cullen, Lowen, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, C. Lee, McKelvey. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, DeCoite, Creagan, Gates, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH/WAL on Tuesday, 02-06-18 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3027 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 35