HI SB3027 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Ocean, Marine Resources, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Ocean, Marine Resources, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the Kahoolawe Island Reserve Commission to restore, preserve, and determine the appropriate uses of Kahoolawe island, and to fund 1 full-time equivalent (1.00 FTE) permanent position for the Kahoolawe Island Reserve Commission. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Kahoolawe Island Reserve Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 393) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2621) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2297) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, L. Thielen. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-18 2:46PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2594 (Same As) 2018-07-10 - Act 140, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1241).