HI HB2644 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 664).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 664).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Applies the solid waste disposal surcharge to waste that is deposited in a landfill, incinerator, or waste-to-energy facility, and applies the surcharge to waste that is shipped out-of-state for disposal. (HB2644 CD1)
Title
Solid Waste; Disposal Surcharge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 664). | |
2010-07-06 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 426). | |
2010-06-21 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-10 (Gov. Msg. No. 627) | |
2010-06-21 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 388) | |
2010-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 2 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 41-10). | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 41-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-23 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ching. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-10 10:00AM in conference room 225. | |
2010-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-10 10:00AM in conference room 225. | |
2010-04-14 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-10 10:00AM in conference room 225. | |
2010-04-13 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-14-10 3:00PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 558). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Morita, Coffman Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Ching. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 535). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; English, Tsutsui, Co-Chair(s); . | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 462). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 465) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3028) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Hemmings; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-10 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-03-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-17 | (S) Reported from ENE/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2741) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-11 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-03-11 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Hooser, Kokubun, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-08 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-10 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to ENE/TIA, WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 139). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 587-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Finnegan, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Sagum. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision-making on Monday, 02-22-10 4:32PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-18 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-18-10 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 204-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-04 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, C. Lee, Sagum, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chang, Chong, Har, Luke. | |
2010-02-02 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-04-10, 9:00 AM. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-02-10 8:30 AM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |