HI HB268 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Act 198, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Act 198, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the board of dental examiners to summarily suspend a license. Establishes procedures for the summary suspension of a license. Specifies that continuing to practice dentistry, or attempting to do so, while the summary suspension is in effect is grounds for revocation of the license. (SD1)
Title
Dentistry; Board of Dental Examiners; Summary Suspension of License
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | Act 198, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299). |
2015-07-06 | House | Act 198, on 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299). |
2015-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 646). |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-04-28 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-27 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2015-04-27 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-08-15. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Slom. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 351). |
2015-04-08 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-07 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 410) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Kahele, Keith-Agaran). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-15. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1303) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 927) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Kahele, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Nishihara. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 167). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Jordan, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 843) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-05 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2015-03-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-05-15 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-03 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-05-15 at 2:15 PM in room 325. |
2015-02-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-03-15 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-03-15 at 2:00 PM in room 325. |
2015-02-23 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-24-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-20 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-24-15 at 2:00 PM in room 325. |
2015-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-20-15 4:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 111) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-04 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-02-03 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-04-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-15. |
2015-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 01-29-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 01-29-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB725 (Same As) 2015-03-27 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).