HI HB2705 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a working group to assess physical education in kindergarten through elementary grades in public schools and report to the Legislature. (HB2705 HD1)
Title
Public Education; Physical Education; Working Group; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 319-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-05 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Kong, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Ito, Tupola. |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 02-05-16 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |