HI HB2759 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Berg, Ching, Finnegan, C. Lee, Manahan, Marumoto, Morita, Nishimoto, Thielen, Ward, Yamane voting no and Representative(s) Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Berg, Ching, Finnegan, C. Lee, Manahan, Marumoto, Morita, Nishimoto, Thielen, Ward, Yamane voting no and Representative(s) Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaiian Homes Commission (HHC) to allow gaming on Hawaiian Home Lands and to consult with the HHC Act beneficiaries and designate specific Hawaiian Home Lands parcels for the purposes of establishing casino gaming operations. Creates the Hawaii Gaming Commission to regulate casino gaming operations. Imposes a wagering tax on gross receipts of casino gaming operations and provides for distribution to the general fund and Hawaiian Home Lands Trust Fund. (HB2759 HD2)
Title
Hawaiian Home Lands; Gaming
Sponsors
Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Berg, Ching, Finnegan, C. Lee, Manahan, Marumoto, Morita, Nishimoto, Thielen, Ward, Yamane voting no and Representative(s) Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 350-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-09 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Mizuno; 4 Noes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morita, Marumoto, Thielen; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Luke. | |
2010-02-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-09-10 2:30pm in House conference room 325. | |
2010-02-05 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Aquino, Ching, Finnegan, Manahan, Marumoto, Takumi, Thielen, Ward, Yamane voting no (9) and Representative(s) M. Lee, McKelvey excused (2). | |
2010-02-05 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 135-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2010-02-03 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Shimabukuro, Bertram; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Mizuno; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Brower, Nishimoto, Yamane. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 02-03-10 10:30am in House conference room 329. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to HAW, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 8 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |