HI HB2798 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the length of terms of members of the Commission on Fatherhood from two to four years.
Title
Commission on Fatherhood; Terms
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-03 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 72-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-01 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Brower, Belatti, Carroll, Nishimoto, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Bertram, Shimabukuro. | |
2010-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 02-01-10 8:30 AM in House conference room 329. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 8 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |