HI HB2798 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-27 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 5:35PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-27 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 5:35PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the temporary Hawaii veterans treatment court within the first judicial circuit court. Makes appropriation to the judiciary. Effective 1/7/2059, and repealed on 6/30/2021. (SD2)
Title
Hawaii Veterans Court; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 5:35PM in conference room 312. | |
2012-04-25 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 3:00PM in conference room 312. | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-12 3:30PM in conference room 312. | |
2012-04-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-12 3:35PM in conference room 312. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 759). | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Hee, Green, Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 612). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Aquino, Yamane, Keith-Agaran, Cullen Co-Chairs; Cabanilla, M. Lee, Johanson. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 547). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 664) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3350) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Reported from PGM/JDL/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2974) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM/JDL/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-12 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-13 | (S) Re-Referred to PGM/JDL/HTH, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to PGM/JDL, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 302). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 744-12) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-23 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-12 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, M. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa excused (5). | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 641-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Ito, Luke, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Carroll, Coffman, McKelvey. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-14-12 2:05PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Souki excused (4). | |
2012-02-09 | (H) Reported from PBM/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 227-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-02-02 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. | |
2012-02-02 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Souki, Takai, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki, Takumi. | |
2012-01-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM/HLT on Thursday, 02-02-12 11:15AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Referred to PBM/HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and passed first reading |