HI HB2798 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the types of proposed power-generating facilities that trigger an environmental assessment to include new combustion electricity-generating facilities operating commercially after 1/1/2024 that were not previously operational and certain expansions in generating capacity of existing combustion electricity-generating facilities. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Energy.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 387-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-02-01 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2367 (Same As) 2024-01-22 - Referred to EET, CPN.