HI HB304 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB304
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the maximum fee a check casher may charge under a payday loan agreement for deferring the deposit of a check from fifteen per cent to seven per cent of the face value of the check.
Title
Relating To Deferred Deposits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-16 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-16-21. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB205 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB304 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB304 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=304&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB304_.HTM |