HI SB205 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB205
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the maximum fee a check casher may charge under a payday loan agreement for deferring the deposit of a check from fifteen per cent to seven per cent of the face value of the check.
Title
Relating To Deferred Deposits.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB304 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB205 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
SB205 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=205&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB205_.HTM |