HI HB330 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public notices to provide contact information for general information and requests for accommodations, auxiliary aides, or services for individuals with disabilities. (HB330 HD2)
Title
Public Agency Meetings; Notice Requirements; Disabilities
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 565) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-02-14 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Ito, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kawakami, C. Lee, Thielen. |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-14-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Say excused (2). |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 129) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-01-31 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Cabanilla, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 01-31-13 11:15AM in conference room 329. |
2013-01-29 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-31-13. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 01-29-13 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB863 (Same As) 2013-02-07 - The committee on TEC deferred the measure.