HI SB863 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - The committee on TEC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - The committee on TEC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public notices to provide a contact person, including contact information, to whom requests for accommodations for individuals with disabilities may be made. Requires notices that are posted electronically to conform to the applicable provisions under the Rehabilitation Act of 1973.
Title
Public Agency Meetings; Notice Requirements; Disabilities
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] |
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee on TEC deferred the measure. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 1:16PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to TEC, JDL. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB330 (Same As) 2013-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=863&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SB863_.HTM |