HI HB336 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DNA collection from those arrested for violent crimes. (HB336 HD1)
Title
Crime
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-13 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Pine, Takai excused (2). | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 220) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Aquino, Awana, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Saiki, Takumi, Pine; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Rhoads; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Souki, Yamashita. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-09-09 3:30pm in conference room 309. | |
2009-01-29 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 01-29-09 8:30am in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB785 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.