HI HB429 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB429
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS/LAB, HED, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS/LAB, HED, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits smoking and tobacco use, including the use of electronic smoking devices, by any person on the premises of the University of Hawaii.
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS/LAB, HED, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HLT/LAB, HED, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB429 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to HLT/LAB, HED, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=429&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB429_.HTM |