HI HB430 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB430
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires ballots returned by mail to be postmarked on or before election day. Deems ballots with illegible postmarks to have been timely postmarked if received by a certain time. Requires the county clerks to coordinate with the United States Postal Service to establish places of deposit at each post office or for the collection of ballots. Requires an additional preliminary campaign spending report to be filed on June 30 of a general election year. Establishes a flexible fine structure for violations of campaign finance laws by certain noncandidate committees. Requires campaign advertisements to include disclosure notices on every page or section of the advertisement.
Title
Relating To Election Reform.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB430 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB802 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to JDC.
SB802 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=430&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB430_.HTM |