HI HB49 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB49
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the provision of the state constitution that prohibits nuclear fission power plants to be constructed or radioactive material to be disposed of without the prior approval by a two-thirds vote in the House of Representatives and the Senate.
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article Xi, Section 8, Of The Hawaii State Constitution, Relating To Nuclear Energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to EEP, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB49 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to EEP, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=49&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB49_.HTM |