HI HB537 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB537
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires parking placards for disabled persons to bear the disabled person's photograph and prominently display its expiration date. Establishes a penalty for using a placard after the death of the person to whom the placard was issued.
Title
Relating To Parking For Disabled Persons.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Friday, 02-03-17 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB537 (Carry Over) 2017-02-03 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=537&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB537_.HTM |