HI HB545 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a supplemental environmental assessment or supplemental environmental impact statement after the passage of 15 years from the date of the acceptance of the statement or the determination of a finding of no significant impact, if the proposed action is not completed.
Title
Environmental Impact Statements; Environmental Assessments; Supplements
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Denny Coffman [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Hermina Morita [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Jessica Wooley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-03 | (H) Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-05-09 9:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-05-09 9:00am in House conference room 312. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Re-referred to EEP, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=545&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB545_.HTM |