HI HB545 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals various non-general funds and accounts and transfers the unencumbered balances to the general fund. Establishes the University of Hawaii quasi-endowment trust fund. Makes conforming amendments. (SD1)
Title
University of Hawaii; Non-General Funds; Repeal; Transfer of Balances; Establishment
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from HEA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1153) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HEA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye, Kidani, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kahele. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-15 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HEA, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 57). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 682), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-03-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 419) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-10 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Kong, LoPresti, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2015-02-09 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-10-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |