HI HB545 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB545
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that board and commission holdover members shall not hold office beyond the end of the second regular legislative session following the expiration of the member's term of office regardless of any conflicting statutes.
Title
Relating To Boards And Commissions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB545 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 2
SB1196 (Same As) 2023-04-18 - Senate Conferees Appointed: McKelvey Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Awa.
SB1196 (Same As) 2023-04-18 - Senate Conferees Appointed: McKelvey Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Awa.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=545&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB545_.HTM |