HI HB553 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Vetoed on 07/13/2015 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1328).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Vetoed on 07/13/2015 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1328).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows part-time and full-time graduate student assistants employed by UH to collectively bargain their wages, hours, and other terms; provided that no collective bargaining agreement shall take effect prior to July 1, 2016. Requires UH and the relevant exclusive representatives to meet and report to the legislature. (HB553 CD1)
Title
Collective Bargaining Units; UH Graduate Students
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | Senate | Vetoed on 07/13/2015 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1328). |
2015-07-13 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1328). |
2015-06-29 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1243) |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/29/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1243) |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD {cdraft} with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tsuji excused (1). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Harimoto, Ruderman, L. Thielen . 2 No(es): Senator(s) Slom, Wakai. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 142). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 142) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Choy, Keohokalole, Ichiyama, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:45PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 1:15PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 1:15PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-15 1:15PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 626). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Choy added as Co-Chair. Representative Ichiyama discharged as Co-Chair; Added as Member. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Keith-Agaran, Tokuda Co-Chairs. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Ichiyama, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Matsumoto. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 554) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kahele, Riviere, L. Thielen . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1528) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-15 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from HEA/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1131) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Slom. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HEA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Kahele, Kidani; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Slom. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HEA/JDL, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 59). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ohno, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 729), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-15 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 480), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-02-12 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Kong, LoPresti, Ohno, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Say. |
2015-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 02-12-15 2:03PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 89) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2015-02-06 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Nakashima, Keohokalole, Har, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Aquino, Ichiyama. |
2015-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-06-15 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB638 (Same As) 2015-03-17 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.