HI HB575 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 215, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1329).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 215, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1329).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a process for the re-leasing or renegotiation of a lease for public lands classified as commercial or industrial use near the end of the life of the lease. Permits DLNR to extend public land leases to school or government entities without recourse to auction, with certain exceptions. (HB575 CD1)
Title
Relating To Public Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 215, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1329). |
2017-07-13 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 215, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1329). |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-23-17 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161) |
2017-06-23 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1161) |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Nakamura, Onishi voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan, Thielen, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Tupola excused (2). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 183). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 183) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, K. Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 5:03PM in Conference Room 224. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 3:01PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 2:05PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 at 4:00PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday, 04-24-17 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 224. |
2017-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-24-17 2:05PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; L. Thielen, K. Kahele Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Cullen Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 589) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1595) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1089) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Inouye, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has rescheduled its public hearing to 03-20-17 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-17 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 115). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 930), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Tupola. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 144) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-03 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-03-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB274 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Referred to WTL, WAM.