HI HB613 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB613
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the real property tax exemption special fund and requires that a portion of conveyance tax revenues be deposited into the special fund. Allows the county to use special fund moneys to offset any lost revenue incurred due to property tax exemptions provided to qualified senior citizen property owners. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Relating To The Conveyance Tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB613 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=613&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB613_.HTM |