HI HB662 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-08 - The committee(s) on OMH/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-08 - The committee(s) on OMH/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides Department of Land and Natural Resources lease preferences for the reconstruction, restoration, repair, or use of kanaka maoli fishponds. Defines "kanaka maoli fishponds" as "Hawaiian fishponds." Effective July 1, 2013.
Title
State Leases; Kanaka Maoli Fishponds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on OMH/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH/WAL on Friday, 02-08-13 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-31 | House | Re-referred to OMH/WAL, referral sheet 10 |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to OMH, WAL, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=662&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB662_.HTM |