HI HB664 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB664
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes physician assistants to sign orders for respiratory therapy and plans of care. Expands the class of health care providers under whom respiratory therapists may practice respiratory care to include physician assistants and advanced practice registered nurses. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-07 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 96) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-02-01 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Amato. |
2023-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-01-23 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB599 (Same As)
HB664 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
HB664 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Subjects
Advanced Practice Registered Nurses
Orders
Physician Assistants
Qualified Direction
Respiratory Therapists
Orders
Physician Assistants
Qualified Direction
Respiratory Therapists
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=664&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB664_HD1_.HTM |