HI HB697 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a temporary health insurance program for unemployed individuals. Appropriates unspecified funds. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB697 HD1)
Title
Temporary Health Insurance for the Unemployed; Appropriations
Sponsors
Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Michael Magaoay [D] | Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] |
Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to LBR/CPN, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 87). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-2009. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 806) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-26 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2009-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-09 4:00pm in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Re-referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 18 | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). | |
2009-02-11 | (H) Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 207), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Mizuno, Brower, Belatti, Bertram, Carroll, Nishimoto, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Shimabukuro. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Yamane, Nishimoto, Belatti, Bertram, Brower, Carroll, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: Finnegan; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Shimabukuro. | |
2009-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT-HUS on Friday, 02-06-09 9:00 AM in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |