HI HB770 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - (H) The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - (H) The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of human services to allow persons to conduct child and vulnerable adult abuse perpetrator checks on the department's website as part of background checks for employment, volunteer, licensure, or certification purposes. (HB770 HD1)
Title
Child Abuse; Adult Abuse; Background Checks
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | (H) The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-09-12 8:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-02-06 | (H) Re-referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 16 | |
2012-02-06 | (H) HD 1 adopted and recommitted to HUS for further consideration with none voting no and Representative(s) McKelvey, Takai excused. | |
2012-02-06 | (H) Recommends recommittal to HUS. | |
2012-02-06 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 123-12) as amended in HD 1. | |
2012-01-30 | (H) The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Mizuno, Jordan, Belatti, Hanohano, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: C. Lee. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 01-30-12 8:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HUS, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |