HI HB774 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB774
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Board of Agriculture, when negotiating and executing leases for agricultural and non-agricultural park lands, to establish a preference for farmers who produce food to be consumed locally and Hawaiian plants. (HB774 HD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-10-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-02-03 | House | Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 12 |
2017-02-03 | House | Recommitted to AGR as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and none excused. |
2017-02-03 | House | Recommends recommittal to AGR. |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 31) as amended in HD 1. |
2017-02-01 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-01-17 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to AGR, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB774 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.