HI HB792 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB792
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the use of customer self-supply facilities economically viable by requiring the Public Utilities Commission to develop standards and requirements to expedite the interconnection of qualifying customer self-supply facilities and allowing qualifying customers to select an applicable rate schedule.
Title
Relating To Electricity Generation.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-09-17 11:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-17 at 11:00AM. |
2017-02-06 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB792 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=792&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB792_.HTM |