HI HB803 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB803
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of education to develop an evidence-based vision screening and eye assessment system for children in pre-kindergarten through grade twelve. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To School Based Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB820 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB803 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB803 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=803&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB803_.HTM |