HI HB803 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB803
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires condominiums to include the estimated cost of fire safety equipment or installations as part of their estimated replacement reserves.
Title
Relating To Condominium Reserve Requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB803 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB855 (Same As) 2023-07-05 - Act 199, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1302).
SB855 (Same As) 2023-07-05 - Act 199, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1302).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=803&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB803_.HTM |