HI HB896 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent the retail tobacco permit law. (HB896 HD1)
Title
Retail Tobacco Permit; Repeal Sunset
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-04-06 | (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | |
2009-04-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-09 9:30 AM in conference room 211. | |
2009-03-25 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2009-03-25 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 961) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2009-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2009-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 03-18-09 2:40pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-03-13 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-09 3:00 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to HTH, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 162). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-2009. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 808) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-27 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Wooley, Yamashita, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Tokioka, Ward. | |
2009-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-09 12:00pm in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, McKelvey, Takai, Takumi, Tokioka excused (5). | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 510), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-13 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Belatti, Bertram, Brower, Carroll, Mizuno, Shimabukuro, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-13-09 8:30am in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |