HI HB905 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-15 - (S) Act 004, 2/15/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-15 - (S) Act 004, 2/15/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a state agency to require a provider to participate in health and human services delivery planning as a condition of the provider's contract. Effective July 1, 2012. (HB905 CD1)
Title
Health and Human Services Delivery Plan; Procurement
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Joey Manahan [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | (S) Act 004, 2/15/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104). | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Act 004, on 2/15/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104). | |
2012-02-01 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2012-02-02 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 6). | |
2012-02-01 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 4). | |
2012-02-01 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Okamura, Say excused (2). | |
2012-02-01 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2012-01-30 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 02-01-12. | |
2012-01-30 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 4-12). | |
2012-01-30 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 02-01-12 | |
2012-01-30 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 4-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-01-25 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Mizuno, Morikawa, Jordan; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ching. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 01-25-12 2:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 01-23-12 at 1:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-11 11:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-11 1:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-11 1:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-20-11 1:35PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Chun Oakland, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Mizuno, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Jordan, Ching. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 512) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from HTH/HMS/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1119) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-04-07 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2011-04-06 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-07-11 9:55AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-04-06 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom. | |
2011-04-06 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/HMS/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-06-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Re-Referred to HTH/HMS/WAM. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Wakai, Slom. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to HTH/HMS, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 193). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11 | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 897) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Choy, Yamashita. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-03-11 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 292), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Belatti. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Yamane, Morikawa, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Belatti. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Monday, 02-07-11 10:15AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1141 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.