HI HB905 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB905
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the court to appoint counsel to indigent parents and to make every effort to do so at the first hearing attended by the parent.
Title
Relating To The Child Protective Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] |
Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB214 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB905 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB905 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=905&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB905_.HTM |