HI HB945 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows designees be appointed to the panel that reviews applicants for the paroling authority and nominates members for the Governor's consideration.
Title
Hawaii Paroling Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4). |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 297), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Hashem, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-07-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1176 (Same As) 2013-06-18 - Act 117, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217).