HI HB970 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB970
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the extension of the increase in the county surcharge on the State general excise tax, and replaces financing for the Honolulu mass transit project with private funding.
Title
Relating To Private Financing For Mass Transit And Repealing General Excise Tax Surcharge.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB970 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=970&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB970_.HTM |